US SB618 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 368.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 368.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish the United States Foundation for International Conservation to promote long-term management of protected and conserved areas, and for other purposes.
Title
United States Foundation for International Conservation Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Pete Ricketts [R-NE] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 368. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Cardin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6727 (Related) 2024-03-21 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 42 - 7.