US SB609 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-299.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-299.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Chiropractic Care Available to All Veterans Act of 2017 This bill amends the Department of Veterans Affairs Health Care Programs Enhancement Act of 2001 to require a program under which the Secretary of Veterans Affairs provides chiropractic care and services to veterans through Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) medical centers and clinics to be carried out at: (1) no fewer than 75 medical centers by December 31, 2018, and (2) all medical centers by December 31, 2020. Chiropractic examinations and services are included within required VA medical, rehabilitative, and preventive health care services.
Title
Chiropractic Care Available to All Veterans Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-299. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB103 (Related) 2017-01-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2251 (Related) 2017-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2251 (Related) 2017-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Alternative treatments
Armed forces and national security
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
Veterans' medical care
Armed forces and national security
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/609/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s609/BILLS-115s609is.pdf |