US SB607 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 254.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 254.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC) to address insufficient compensation of its personnel without regard to civil service laws. FERC must consult with the Office of Personnel Management when making a determination of the appropriate compensation for its personnel. The Department of Energy must report on its authority to implement flexible compensation models for the purposes of hiring, recruiting, and retaining employees who conduct scientific, technological, engineering, or mathematical work.
Title
Timely Review of Infrastructure Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 254. |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment. With written report No. 116-134. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1426 (Same As) 2020-12-10 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 610.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Employee hiring
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Public contracts and procurement
Employee hiring
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Public contracts and procurement