US SB605 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-27 - Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-112.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-27 - Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-112.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Litigation Relief for Forest Management Projects Act This bill amends the Forest and Rangeland Renewable Resources Planning Act of 1974 and the Federal land Policy and Management Act of 1976 to prohibit the Department of Agriculture (USDA) or the Department of the Interior from being required to engage in any additional consultation with respect to: (1) the listing of a species as threatened or endangered, or a designation of a critical habitat, if a land management plan or land use plan, respectively, has been adopted by USDA or Interior as of the date of the listing or designation; or (2) any provision of such an adopted plan.
Title
Litigation Relief for Forest Management Projects Act
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-27 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-112. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1483 (Same As) 2017-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB2936 (Related) 2017-11-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HR595 (Similar To) 2017-11-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2068 (Related) 2017-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB2936 (Related) 2017-11-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HR595 (Similar To) 2017-11-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2068 (Related) 2017-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Endangered and threatened species
Forests, forestry, trees
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources
Public participation and lobbying
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources
Public participation and lobbying
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/605/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s605/BILLS-115s605is.pdf |