US SB60 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Withdraws specified National Forest System land in the Custer Gallatin National Forest in Park County, Montana, identified on the map titled "Emigrant Crevice Proposed Withdrawal Area," dated November 10, 2016, from (1) location, entry, and patent under mining laws; and (2) disposition under all laws pertaining to mineral and geothermal leasing. Any land within the withdrawal area that is acquired by the federal government after enactment of this bill must be immediately withdrawn in accordance with this bill.
Title
Yellowstone Gateway Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HB426 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB426 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Mining
Montana
Oil and gas
Public lands and natural resources
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Mining
Montana
Oil and gas
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/60/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s60/BILLS-116s60is.pdf |