US SB60 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends the federal criminal code to make it unlawful to knowingly and willfully sell or forge a ticket to a presidential inaugural ceremony or to use, unlawfully possess, or exhibit a forged ticket with the intent to defraud. Exempts the sale of tickets to a presidential inaugural ceremony that has already occurred or by an official presidential inaugural committee. Imposes a fine and/or prison term of up to one year for violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to prohibit the sale and counterfeiting of Presidential inaugural tickets.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-02-09 Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2009-01-14 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2009-01-14 Message on Senate action sent to the House.
2009-01-14 Received in the House.
2009-01-13 Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S350-351)
2009-01-13 Senate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S350-351)
2009-01-06 Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as introduced: CR S64)
2009-01-06 Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S64)

Same As/Similar To

HB3600 (Same As) 2009-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback