US SB598 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to authorize additional monies to the Public Housing Capital Fund of the Department of Housing and Urban Development, and for other purposes.
Title
Public Housing Emergency Response Act
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB679 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HB235 (Related) 2021-01-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB235 (Related) 2021-01-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/598/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s598/BILLS-117s598is.pdf |