US SB592 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-11 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-11 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Securities and Exchange Commission to issue final rules requiring a registered issuer to disclose in its mandatory annual report or annual proxy statement whether any member of its governing body has expertise or experience in cybersecurity; and if no member has such expertise or experience, describe what other company cybersecurity aspects were taken into account by the persons responsible for identifying and evaluating nominees for the governing body.
Title
Cybersecurity Disclosure Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1595-1596) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1731 (Same As) 2020-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 518.
SB4629 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB4629 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Computer security and identity theft
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government information and archives
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Computer security and identity theft
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government information and archives
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/592/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s592/BILLS-116s592is.pdf |