US SB590 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 85.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 85.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to authorize the Secretary of Agriculture to maintain or replace certain facilities and structures for commercial recreation services at Smith Gulch in Idaho, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill states that the authorization of the Department of Agriculture (USDA) under the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act, with respect to the Salmon River in Idaho, to maintain or replace facilities or structures for commercial recreation services at Smith Gulch may include improvements or replacements that: are consistent with the management of a specified river segment of the main Salmon River pursuant to the Central Idaho Wilderness Act of 1980, and would reduce the impact of commercial recreation facilities or services on wilderness or wild and scenic river resources and values. USDA may also consider other specified facilities and equipment.
Title
A bill to authorize the Secretary of Agriculture to maintain or replace certain facilities and structures for commercial recreation services at Smith Gulch in Idaho, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 85. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-67. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1482 (Same As) 2018-07-17 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 645.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Idaho
Lighting and heating
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Idaho
Lighting and heating
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats