US SB576 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Follow the Rules Act Follow the Rules Act (Sec. 2) This bill extends the prohibition (regarding employment in the federal government) against a person taking, failing to take, or threatening to take or fail to take a personnel action against any employee or applicant for employment for refusing to obey an order that would require the individual to violate a law to personnel actions against such an individual for refusing to obey an order that would violate a rule or regulation.
Title
Follow the Rules Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-30. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB657 (Same As) 2017-06-14 - Became Public Law No: 115-40. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Employee performance
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Employee performance
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics