US SB569 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 252.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 252.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to direct the Secretary of Agriculture to transfer certain National Forest System land to the State of South Dakota, and for other purposes.
Title
Gilt Edge Mine Conveyance Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 252. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin with an amendment. With written report No. 117-55. |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1638 (Same As) 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 524.
HR1396 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1396 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.