US SB553 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 373.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 373.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Commerce to establish the Blockchain Working Group to submit a report to Congress which contains a recommended definition of the distributed ledger technology commonly referred to as blockchain technology, and other specified recommendations regarding this technology. Members of the working group shall serve without receiving any pay.
Title
Blockchain Promotion Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 373. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with amendments. With written report No. 116-177. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1361 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Currency
Intergovernmental relations
Science, technology, communications
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Currency
Intergovernmental relations
Science, technology, communications