US SB551 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1077-1078)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1077-1078)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Denying Firearms and Explosives to Dangerous Terrorists Act of 2015 Amends the federal criminal code to authorize the Attorney General to deny the transfer of a firearm or the issuance of a firearms or explosives license or permit (or revoke such license or permit) if the Attorney General: (1) determines that the transferee is known (or appropriately suspected) to be engaged in terrorism or has provided material support or resources for terrorism, and (2) has a reasonable belief that the transferee may use a firearm in connection with terrorism. Allows any individual whose firearms or explosives license application has been denied to bring legal action to challenge the denial. Extends the prohibition against the sale or distribution of firearms or explosives to include individuals whom the Attorney General has determined to be engaged in terrorist activities. Imposes criminal penalties on individuals engaged in terrorist activities who smuggle or knowingly bring firearms into the United States. Authorizes the Attorney General to withhold information in firearms and explosives license denial revocation lawsuits and from employers if the Attorney General determines that the disclosure of such information would likely compromise national security.
Title
Denying Firearms and Explosives to Dangerous Terrorists Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1077-1078) |
Same As/Similar To
HB368 (Related) 2015-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB1076 (Related) 2015-12-07 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Thompson (CA). Petition No: 114-3. ( ">Discharge petition text with signatures.)
SB2377 (Related) 2015-12-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S8548-8558)
HB1076 (Related) 2015-12-07 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Thompson (CA). Petition No: 114-3. ( ">Discharge petition text with signatures.)
SB2377 (Related) 2015-12-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S8548-8558)
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Firearms and explosives
Judicial review and appeals
Licensing and registrations
Terrorism
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Firearms and explosives
Judicial review and appeals
Licensing and registrations
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/551/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s551/BILLS-114s551is.pdf |