US SB534 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-10)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Became Public Law No: 115-126. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-10)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Became Public Law No: 115-126. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Young Victims from Sexual Abuse and Safe Sport Authorization Act of 2017 This bill amends the Victims of Child Abuse Act of 1990 to extend the duty to report suspected child abuse, including sexual abuse, to certain adults who are authorized to interact with minor or amateur athletes at a facility under the jurisdiction of a national governing body. A national governing body is an amateur sports organization that is recognized by the International Olympic Committee. An individual who is required, but fails, to report suspected child sex abuse is subject to criminal penalties. Additionally, the bill amends the federal criminal code to revise civil remedy provisions for a victim of a human trafficking offense or federal sex offense. Among other things, it changes the civil statute of limitations to 10 years from the date the victim discovers the violation or injury (currently, 10 years from the date the cause of action arose). The bill also extends the statute of limitations for a minor victim of a federal sex offense to file a civil action to 10 years (currently, 3 years) from the date such individual reaches age 18. Finally, the bill amends the Amateur Sports Act of 1978: (1) to authorize national governing bodies to develop training, practices, policies, and procedures to prevent the abuse of minor or amateur athletes; and (2) to require national governing bodies to develop and enforce policies, mechanisms, and procedures to prevent, report, and respond to the abuse of minor or amateur athletes.
Title
Protecting Young Victims from Sexual Abuse and Safe Sport Authorization Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 45 (Y: 406 N: 3 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-126. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-02-14 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-02-07 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-01-30 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-01-30 | House | Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 534 by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S589-591) |
2018-01-30 | House | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2018-01-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-01-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 3 (Roll no. 45). (text: CR H633-634) |
2018-01-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H652-653) |
2018-01-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-01-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 534. |
2018-01-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H633-643) |
2018-01-29 | House | Mr. Poe (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-11-15 | House | Held at the desk. |
2017-11-15 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-11-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.1584 Amendment SA 1584 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-11-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.1584 Amendment SA 1584 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Feinstein. (consideration: CR S7220-7221) In the nature of a substitute. |
2017-11-14 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7220) |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7219-7221; text of measure as reported: CR S7219-7220) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 121. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1973 (Related) 2017-06-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Athletes
Civil actions and liability
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal justice information and records
Domestic violence and child abuse
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Human trafficking
Jurisdiction and venue
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Olympic games
Pornography
Sex offenses
Civil actions and liability
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal justice information and records
Domestic violence and child abuse
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Human trafficking
Jurisdiction and venue
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Olympic games
Pornography
Sex offenses