US SB530 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the president of the Federal Reserve Bank of New York to be appointed by the President, by and with the advice and consent of the Senate. Amends the Federal Reserve Act to require the president of the Federal Reserve Bank of New York to be appointed by the President, by and with the advice and consent of the Senate, for terms of five years. Requires the president of the Federal Reserve Bank of New York to testify annually to certain congressional committees.
Title
A bill to require the president of the Federal Reserve Bank of New York to be appointed by the President, by and with the advice and consent of the Senate.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1032-1033) |
Same As/Similar To
SB1910 (Related) 2015-07-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 176.
SB2132 (Related) 2015-10-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 251.
SB2132 (Related) 2015-10-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 251.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Federal officials
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
New York City
Federal officials
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
New York City
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/530/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s530/BILLS-114s530is.pdf |