US SB512 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nuclear Energy Innovation and Modernization Act This bill directs the Nuclear Regulatory Commission (NRC) to modify the licensing process for commercial advanced nuclear reactor facilities. In addition, the bill amends the Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1990 to revise how the NRC preserves budgeted funds for conducting and accelerating license reviews of commercial advanced nuclear reactor facilities. The NRC must implement a licensing process that is designed to be predictable and efficient while conforming to existing NRC regulatory guidelines. The Department of Energy (DOE) must provide cost sharing grants to license applicants for the purpose of funding a portion of the NRC review fees. The NRC must also develop a new technology-inclusive, regulatory framework by the end of 2024 that encourages greater technological innovation for the advanced nuclear reactor program. The NRC must publish necessary revisions to the guidance on the baseline examination schedule and any subsequent examinations for baffle-former bolts in pressurized water reactors with down-flow configurations. The NRC may issue licenses for utilization facilities that are used in conducting research and development activities related to nuclear energy. The NRC must report to Congress on the status of the licensing process for accident tolerant fuel. The NRC must: (1) report to Congress on the safety and feasibility of extending the duration of uranium recovery licenses from 10 to 20 years, and (2) complete a voluntary pilot program to determine the feasibility of establishing a flat fee structure for routine licensing matters relating to uranium recovery. DOE must issue a long-term federal excess uranium inventory management plan at least every 10 years that details the management of DOE excess uranium inventories.
Title
Nuclear Energy Innovation and Modernization Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 493 (Y: 361 N: 10 NV: 61 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-02 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-12-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 361 - 10 (Roll no. 493). (text: CR H10553-10557) |
2018-12-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10577-10578) |
2018-12-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 512. |
2018-12-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10553-10558) |
2018-12-21 | House | Mr. Kinzinger moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-12-20 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-20 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7957-7962; text: CR S7962) |
2018-12-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.4175 Amendment SA 4175 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.4175 Amendment SA 4175 proposed by Senator Sullivan for Senator Barrasso. (consideration: CR S7962) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | An errata sheet on written report number No. 115-86 was printed. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 108. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-86. Additional views filed. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-52. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Department of Energy
Emergency planning and evacuation
Energy
Energy research
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Licensing and registrations
Mining
Natural disasters
Nuclear power
Nuclear Regulatory Commission (NRC)
Performance measurement
Scientific communication
Strategic materials and reserves
User charges and fees
Congressional oversight
Department of Energy
Emergency planning and evacuation
Energy
Energy research
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Licensing and registrations
Mining
Natural disasters
Nuclear power
Nuclear Regulatory Commission (NRC)
Performance measurement
Scientific communication
Strategic materials and reserves
User charges and fees