US SB509 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide resources for United States nationals unlawfully or wrongfully detained abroad, and for other purposes.
Title
Supporting Americans Wrongfully or Unlawfully Detained Abroad Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 27. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment. Without written report. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
HB6669 (Related) 2023-12-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
HB6669 (Related) 2023-12-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.