US SB496 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-33. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-33. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to repeal the rule issued by the Federal Highway Administration and the Federal Transit Administration entitled "Metropolitan Planning Organization Coordination and Planning Area Reform". (Sec. 1) This bill nullifies the Federal Highway Administration's and the Federal Transit Administration's rule published on December 20, 2016, that revises transportation planning regulations with regard to the alignment of planning regulations with statutory provisions relating to the establishment of metropolitan planning area boundaries and the designation of metropolitan planning organizations.
Title
A bill to repeal the rule issued by the Federal Highway Administration and the Federal Transit Administration entitled "Metropolitan Planning Organization Coordination and Planning Area Reform".
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 231 (Y: 417 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-33. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-05-12 | House | Signed by President. |
2017-05-02 | House | Presented to President. |
2017-04-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-04-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 3 (Roll no. 231). |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2919-2920) |
2017-04-25 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-04-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 496. |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2823-2825) |
2017-04-25 | House | Mr. Lewis (MN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-03-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1695; text: CR S1695) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1346 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held and Ordered to be Reported Prior to Referral See P.L. 115-33 (S. 496) for further action.
SB496 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-33. (TXT | PDF)
SB496 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-33. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Transportation
Public transit
Regional and metropolitan planning
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Department of Transportation
Public transit
Regional and metropolitan planning
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Urban and suburban affairs and development