US SB49 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-10. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-10. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the outstation of the Department of Veterans Affairs in North Ogden, Utah, as the "Major Brent Taylor Vet Center Outstation."
Title
A bill to designate the outstation of the Department of Veterans Affairs in North Ogden, Utah, as the Major Brent Taylor Vet Center Outstation.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 105 (Y: 417 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-10. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2019-03-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 0 (Roll no. 105). (text: CR H2337-2338) |
2019-03-05 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2341) |
2019-03-05 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-03-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 49. |
2019-03-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2337-2340) |
2019-03-05 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-02-06 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S847-848) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S847-848) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB54 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Military personnel and dependents
Utah
Veterans' medical care
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Military personnel and dependents
Utah
Veterans' medical care