US SB4860 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
Pending: Senate Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
Pending: Senate Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that payments made from the Railroad Unemployment Insurance Account shall not be subject to reduction with respect to unemployment compensation programs for qualified railroad employees.
Title
REEF Act Railroad Employee Equity and Fairness Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget. |
Same As/Similar To
HB925 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB8406 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4800 (Related) 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 581.
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB8406 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4800 (Related) 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 581.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4860/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4860/BILLS-116s4860is.pdf |