US SB479 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 74.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 74.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to modify the fire management assistance cost share, and for other purposes.
Title
Fire Suppression and Response Funding Assurance Act
Sponsors
Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 74. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with amendments. With written report No. 118-30. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S459) |
Same As/Similar To
HB480 (Related) 2023-02-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.