US SB476 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-178.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-178.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes the Chesapeake and Ohio Canal National Historical Park Commission for a term of ten years after enactment of this Act.
Title
A bill to amend the Chesapeake and Ohio Canal Development Act to extend to the Chesapeake and Ohio Canal National Historical Park Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] |
Roll Calls
2014-09-17 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 419 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | House | Became Public Law No: 113-178. |
2014-09-26 | House | Signed by President. |
2014-09-19 | House | Presented to President. |
2014-09-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-09-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 0 (Roll no. 506). (text: CR 9/15/2014 H7484) |
2014-09-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7636-7637) |
2014-09-15 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-09-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 476. |
2014-09-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7484-7485) |
2014-09-15 | House | Mr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-09-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 436. |
2014-09-15 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-589. |
2014-07-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-07-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-30 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2014-07-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2014-07-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2014-07-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2014-07-10 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-07-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4355-4364; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S4360; text as passed Senate: CR S4363-4364) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 118. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-64. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-27. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1233) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1232) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2255 (Related) 2013-06-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Dams and canals
District of Columbia
Historic sites and heritage areas
Maryland
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
West Virginia
Dams and canals
District of Columbia
Historic sites and heritage areas
Maryland
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
West Virginia