US SB4729 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends through April 30, 2022, the duty-free treatment provided for certain items under the Generalized System of Preferences, and it extends to November 18, 2029, the date through which certain merchandise processing fees may be charged.
Title
A bill to extend the Generalized System of Preferences, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB4784 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Asia
Customs enforcement
Foreign trade and international finance
Free trade and trade barriers
South Korea
Tariffs
Trade agreements and negotiations
Trade restrictions
User charges and fees
Customs enforcement
Foreign trade and international finance
Free trade and trade barriers
South Korea
Tariffs
Trade agreements and negotiations
Trade restrictions
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4729/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4729/BILLS-116s4729is.pdf |