US SB472 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Douglas County Conservation Act of 2015 Directs the Forest Service to convey approximately 67 acres of certain Forest Service land (Lake Tahoe-Nevada State Park) to the state of Nevada to be used for the conservation of wildlife or natural resources or for a public park. Directs the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to make publicly available a prospectus to solicit one or more concessionaires for the approximately 125 acres of land identified as the Round Hill Pines Resort and the approximately 448 acres of land identified as the Zephyr Shoals. Directs the Forest Service for National Forest System land and the Department of Interior for land managed by the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) to convey approximately 7,990 acres of specified federal land to Douglas County, Nevada, to be used for flood control or any other public purpose. Prohibits such land from being disposed of by the county. Directs the Forest Service or Interior, as appropriate, to conduct one or more sales of specified public lands in the county to qualified bidders, with the option for the state or county to obtain the land for public purposes before the land is offered for sale. Amends the Southern Nevada Public Land Management Act of 1998 to specify the disposition of funds from a sale. Transfers all interest of the United States in the approximately 1,016 acres of certain federal land which shall be held in trust for the Washoe Tribe of Nevada and California, and which shall become part of the Tribe's reservation. Prohibits the conduct of certain gaming on such land. Designates approximately 12,330 acres of specified federal land managed by the BLM, to be known as the Burbank Canyons Wilderness, as a component of the National Wilderness Preservation System. Releases the approximately 1,065 acres of public land in the Burbank Canyons Wilderness study area not designated as wilderness by this Act from further study for designation as wilderness. Authorizes USDA to transfer from the Forest Service to Douglas County, Nevada, certain lands or interests in Forest Service land which are unsuitable for Forest Service administration or necessary for a public purpose.
Title
Douglas County Conservation Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB925 (Related) 2015-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
HB4688 (Related) 2016-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
HB4688 (Related) 2016-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Subjects
Floods and storm protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Nevada
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Nevada
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/472/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s472/BILLS-114s472is.pdf |