US SB46 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 223.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 223.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize the Coral Reef Conservation Act of 2000 and to establish the United States Coral Reef Task Force, and for other purposes.
Title
Restoring Resilient Reefs Act of 2021 Susan L. Williams National Coral Reef Management Fellowship Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 223. |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB160 (Same As) 2022-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 450.
SB5199 (Related) 2022-12-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7035-7036)
HB9453 (Related) 2022-12-07 - Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB5199 (Related) 2022-12-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7035-7036)
HB9453 (Related) 2022-12-07 - Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.