US SB46 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-16 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-16 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the Klamath Tribe Judgment Fund Act, which sets forth how funds credited to the Klamath Tribe must be distributed. The Department of the Interior must disburse to the tribe the balance of funds that were appropriated or deposited into per capita trust accounts and trust accounts for remaining legal fees and administration.
Title
Klamath Tribe Judgment Fund Repeal Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-16 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-07-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-06-28 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4652-4664; text: CR S4664) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 37. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-6. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |