US SB458 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S929-931)
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S929-931)
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency Port of Entry Personnel and Infrastructure Funding Act of 2015 Directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to hire, train, and assign to duty, by September 30, 2020: (1) 5,000 additional full-time U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) officers to serve on all inspection lanes and enforcement teams at U.S. land ports of entry on the northern and southern borders; and (2) 350 full-time support staff for all U.S. ports of entry. Requires DHS to: (1) ensure that each CBP officer is equipped with a secure two-way communication and satellite-enabled device that allows CBP officers to communicate between ports of entry and inspection stations and with other law enforcement entities; and (2) establish a program for awarding grants for the purchase of identification and detection equipment and mobile, hand-held, two-way communication devices for state and local law enforcement officers serving on the southern border. Authorizes CBP to aid in the enforcement of federal customs, immigration, and agriculture laws by: (1) designing, constructing, and modifying U.S. ports of entry, living quarters for personnel, technology and equipment, and other structures and facilities; (2) acquiring land deemed necessary to carry out the CBP's duties under this Act; and (3) constructing additional ports of entry along the southern and northern borders. Directs CBP to give priority consideration to projects that will substantially reduce commercial and passenger vehicle and pedestrian crossing wait times, increase trade, travel efficiency, and the projected total annual volume, and enhance safety and security, at border facilities at one or more ports of entry on the same border. Authorizes CBP and the General Services Administration, over a 10-year period, to enter into cost-sharing or reimbursement agreements, or accept donations of real or personal property or nonpersonal services, to facilitate the construction, alteration, operation, or maintenance of a new or existing facility or other infrastructure at a port of entry under their jurisdiction, custody, and control. Directs DHS to: (1) develop a strategic plan for standardized collection of vehicle wait times at land ports of entry and update it to reflect new practices, timelines, tools, and assessments; (2) develop a standardized model for the allocation of CBP officers and support staff at land ports of entry; and (3) identify and adopt at least two new, outcome-based performance measures that support the trade facilitation goals of CBP.
Title
Emergency Port of Entry Personnel and Infrastructure Funding Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S929-931) |
Same As/Similar To
HB883 (Same As) 2015-02-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
SB208 (Related) 2015-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB208 (Related) 2015-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Agricultural trade
Animal and plant health
Appropriations
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign trade and international finance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Law enforcement officers
Performance measurement
Animal and plant health
Appropriations
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign trade and international finance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Law enforcement officers
Performance measurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/458/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s458/BILLS-114s458is.pdf |