US SB450 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pacific Defenders of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act This bill directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the presentation of a Congressional Gold Medal in commemoration of members of the Armed Forces who fought in defense of Guam, Wake Island, and the Philippine Archipelago between December 7, 1941, and May 10, 1942, and who died or were imprisoned by the Japanese military in the Philippines, Japan, Korea, Manchuria, Wake Island, and Guam from April 9, 1942, until September 2, 1945, in recognition of their personal sacrifice and service to the United States. Following its presentation, the gold medal shall be given to the Smithsonian Institution where it shall be displayed and made available for research.
Title
Pacific Defenders of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
China
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Guam
Japan
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
North Korea
Philippines
South Korea
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Asia
China
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Guam
Japan
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
North Korea
Philippines
South Korea
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/450/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s450/BILLS-115s450is.pdf |