US SB4478 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of State to ensure that the Office to Monitor and Combat Trafficking in Persons and the Bureau of Diplomatic Security receive timely and regular information regarding visa denials based on grounds related to human trafficking. The bill also extends (1) to June 30 the deadline for submission of the annual Trafficking in Persons Report, and (2) through FY2025 the survivor-led Advisory Council on Human Trafficking.
Title
LIFT Act Leveraging Information on Foreign Traffickers Act
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5664 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human trafficking
International affairs
Law enforcement administration and funding
Sanctions
Visas and passports
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human trafficking
International affairs
Law enforcement administration and funding
Sanctions
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4478/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4478/BILLS-116s4478is.pdf |