US SB430 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to extend the Secure Rural Schools and Community Self-Determination Act of 2000. This bill extends the Secure Rural Schools and Community Self-Determination Act of 2000 through FY2020, including provisions concerning secure payments to eligible states, territories, and counties containing federal land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to extend the Secure Rural Schools and Community Self-Determination Act of 2000.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-12SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-11-21SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
2019-02-11SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB3048 (Same As) 2019-06-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback