US SB430 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-12 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-111.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-12 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-111.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Small Business Opportunity and Protection Act of 2013 - Treats the surviving spouse of a service-disabled veteran who acquires the ownership interest in a small business of the deceased veteran as such veteran, for purposes of eligibility for VA service-disabled small business contracting goals and preferences, for a period of: (1) 10 years after the veteran's death, if such veteran was either 100% disabled or died from a service-connected disability; or (2) 3 years after such death, if the veteran was less than 100% disabled and did not die from a service-connected disability. Treats a small business acquired by the surviving spouse or dependent from a member killed during active duty as a small business owned and controlled by a service-disabled veteran, for purposes of VA small business contracting goals and preferences. Continues such treatment for the period beginning on the date of the member's death and ending on the earlier of: (1) the date on which the surviving spouse remarries or relinquishes, or the date on which the surviving dependent relinquishes, such ownership interest; or (2) ten years after the member's death.
Title
Veterans Small Business Opportunity and Protection Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-111. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB495 (Related) 2013-06-12 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-111.
HB3098 (Related) 2013-09-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB944 (Related) 2013-12-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 258.
SB1950 (Related) 2014-02-04 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S736)
SB1982 (Related) 2014-02-27 - S.AMDT.2766 SA 2766 fell when SA 2747 fell. (consideration: CR S1210)
SB2413 (Related) 2014-06-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB3098 (Related) 2013-09-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB944 (Related) 2013-12-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 258.
SB1950 (Related) 2014-02-04 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S736)
SB1982 (Related) 2014-02-27 - S.AMDT.2766 SA 2766 fell when SA 2747 fell. (consideration: CR S1210)
SB2413 (Related) 2014-06-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Disability and paralysis
Military personnel and dependents
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Disability and paralysis
Military personnel and dependents
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/430/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s430/BILLS-113s430is.pdf |