US SB4134 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S2340-2341)
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S2340-2341)
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to direct the President to submit to Congress a report on United States Government efforts to collect, analyze, and preserve evidence and information related to war crimes and other atrocities committed during the full-scale Russian invasion of Ukraine since February 24, 2022, and for other purposes.
Title
Ukraine Invasion War Crimes Deterrence and Accountability Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S2340-2341) |
Same As/Similar To
HB7276 (Related) 2022-06-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 417.
SB5233 (Related) 2022-12-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S7103)
SB5233 (Related) 2022-12-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S7103)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/4134/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s4134/BILLS-117s4134is.pdf |