US SB411 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 158.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 158.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes in the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), for a two-year period, a Counter Threats Advisory Board, which shall be composed of senior representatives of DHS operational components and headquarters elements, and shall coordinate DHS intelligence activities, policy, and information related to its mission and functions that counter threats. The board's charter shall direct it to focus on the current threat environment and the importance of aligning DHS activities to counter threats under the Secretary's guidance. The DHS Under Secretary for Intelligence and Analysis shall serve as the chair of the board.
Title
Counter Threats Advisory Board Act of 2019 Counterterrorism Advisory Board Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 158. |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 116-59. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB769 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Terrorism
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Terrorism