US SB41 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Prescription Drug Price Negotiation Act of 2017 This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to require the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to negotiate with pharmaceutical companies regarding prices for drugs covered under the Medicare prescription drug benefit. Current law prohibits CMS from doing so.
Title
Medicare Prescription Drug Price Negotiation Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB242 (Same As) 2017-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1688 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3748 (Related) 2017-09-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1688 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3748 (Related) 2017-09-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Inflation and prices
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Health care costs and insurance
Inflation and prices
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/41/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s41/BILLS-115s41is.pdf |