US SB405 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stop Taxing Death and Disability Act This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to exclude from the gross income of an individual the discharge of student loans or private education loans due to the death or disability of the student. The bill also amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 to require the Department of Education (ED) to discharge the liability on loans that parents received on behalf of a student who: (1) has become permanently and totally disabled, or (2) is unable to engage in any substantial gainful activity due to a physical or mental impairment that can be expected to result in death or has lasted or is expected to last continuously for at least 60 months. (Under current law, ED is required to discharge the loans to parents if the student dies.)
Title
Stop Taxing Death and Disability Act
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On Passage of the Bill H.R. 1 (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1659 (Related) 2017-03-21 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1 (Related) 2017-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 115-97. (TXT | PDF)
HR619 (Similar To) 2017-11-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1 (Related) 2017-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 115-97. (TXT | PDF)
HR619 (Similar To) 2017-11-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.