US SB404 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-27 - Became Public Law No: 112-137.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-27 - Became Public Law No: 112-137.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Instructs the Secretary of the Interior to modify a land grant patent issued to the Great Lakes Shipwreck Historical Society, Chippewa County, Michigan. Makes the modification made to the patent effective upon being recorded in the Office of the Register of Deeds of Chippewa County.
Title
A bill to modify a land grant patent issued by the Secretary of the Interior.
Sponsors
Sen. Carl Levin [D-MI] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-18 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 380 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 380 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 380 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-27 | House | Became Public Law No: 112-137. |
2012-06-27 | House | Signed by President. |
2012-06-20 | House | Presented to President. |
2012-06-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-06-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 380 - 0 (Roll no. 380). (text: CR H3713) |
2012-06-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3722-3723) |
2012-06-18 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2012-06-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 404. |
2012-06-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3713-3714) |
2012-06-18 | House | Mr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2012-04-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 300. |
2012-04-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-433. |
2012-02-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2012-02-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-02-29 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged. |
2011-10-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. |
2011-10-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2011-10-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6692; text as passed Senate: CR S6692) |
2011-08-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 136. |
2011-08-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/02/2011 without amendment. With written report No. 112-56. |
2011-07-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 112-124. |
2011-02-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3411 (Same As) 2012-01-24 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Great Lakes
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Marine and inland water transportation
Michigan
Public lands and natural resources
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Marine and inland water transportation
Michigan
Public lands and natural resources