US SB3960 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 35, United States Code, to provide a good faith exception to the imposition of fines for false assertions and certifications, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to amend title 35, United States Code, to provide a good faith exception to the imposition of fines for false assertions and certifications, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2024-06-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4198; text: CR S4198) |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7803 (Same As) 2024-05-16 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.