US SB3912 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to hold law enforcement accountable for misconduct in court, improve transparency through data collection, and reform police training and policies.
Title
Justice in Policing Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB35 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate.
HB1714 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
HB3364 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3536 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB4168 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB4339 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB7089 (Related) 2020-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7100 (Related) 2020-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7120 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 490.
SB488 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB2355 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3063 (Related) 2019-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3956 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1714 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
HB3364 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3536 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB4168 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB4339 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB7089 (Related) 2020-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7100 (Related) 2020-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7120 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 490.
SB488 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB2355 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3063 (Related) 2019-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3956 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Aging
Assault and harassment offenses
Aviation and airports
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Customs enforcement
Department of Justice
Detention of persons
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Due process and equal protection
Elementary and secondary education
Employee hiring
Employee performance
Employment and training programs
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Firearms and explosives
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hate crimes
Human rights
Immigration status and procedures
Judicial procedure and administration
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Labor-management relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Legal fees and court costs
Mental health
Military civil functions
Military facilities and property
Motor vehicles
Pedestrians and bicycling
Performance measurement
Personnel records
Photography and imaging
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Right of privacy
Sound recording
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication
Violent crime
Women's health
Administrative remedies
Aging
Assault and harassment offenses
Aviation and airports
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Customs enforcement
Department of Justice
Detention of persons
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Due process and equal protection
Elementary and secondary education
Employee hiring
Employee performance
Employment and training programs
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Firearms and explosives
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hate crimes
Human rights
Immigration status and procedures
Judicial procedure and administration
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Labor-management relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Legal fees and court costs
Mental health
Military civil functions
Military facilities and property
Motor vehicles
Pedestrians and bicycling
Performance measurement
Personnel records
Photography and imaging
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Right of privacy
Sound recording
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication
Violent crime
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3912/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3912/BILLS-116s3912is.pdf |