US SB3825 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-239.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-239.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 3903 Melear Drive in Arlington, Texas, as the "Ron Wright Post Office Building".
Title
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 3903 Melear Drive in Arlington, Texas, as the "Ron Wright Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-239. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-12-16 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-12-01 | House | Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 1499, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 4601, as amended; H.R. 4772, as amended; H.R. 4899; H.R. 5943, as amended; H.R. 7158, as amended; H.R. 8203; H.R. 9308; and S. 3825; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 744, as amended; and H. Res. 922, as amended. (consideration: CR H8700-8701; text: CR H8700) |
2022-12-01 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1499, proceedings on S. 3825 are considered vacated. |
2022-11-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3825. |
2022-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8641; text: CR H8641) |
2022-11-29 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-05-27 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-05-27 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2679; text: CR S2679) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 325. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6626 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR1499 (Related) 2022-11-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1499 (Related) 2022-11-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.