US SB381 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 160.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 160.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to repeal the Act entitled "An Act to confer jurisdiction on the State of Iowa over offenses committed by or against Indians on the Sac and Fox Indian Reservation". (Sec. 1) This bill repeals the Act entitled "An Act to confer jurisdiction on the State of Iowa over offenses committed by or against Indians on the Sac and Fox Indian Reservation."
Title
A bill to repeal the Act entitled "An Act to confer jurisdiction on the State of Iowa over offenses committed by or against Indians on the Sac and Fox Indian Reservation".
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 160. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-122. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1074 (Related) 2018-12-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-301.
Subjects
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Federal-Indian relations
Iowa
Jurisdiction and venue
Native Americans
State and local courts
Federal-Indian relations
Iowa
Jurisdiction and venue
Native Americans
State and local courts