US SB374 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 365.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 365.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concrete Masonry Products Research, Education, and Promotion Act of 2017 This bill directs the Department of Commerce to issue orders applicable to U.S. manufacturers of concrete masonry products. Any such order must provide for the establishment of a Concrete Masonry Products Board to carry out a program of generic promotion, research, and education regarding concrete masonry products. An order must also provide that assessments be paid by concrete masonry product manufacturers for concrete masonry products manufactured and marketed in the United States. At least 50% of the assessments paid by a manufacturer must be used to support research, education, and generic promotion programs and projects in support of the geographic region of the manufacturer. During the 60-day period preceding the proposed effective date of an order, Commerce shall conduct a referendum for order approval among manufacturers. The bill allows petition and review of an order, and order enforcement through U.S. district courts. The bill requires a study and a report by: (1) the Government Accountability Office on how the board spends assessments collected, the impact of board activities, and other matters relating to the demand for concrete masonry products; and (2) Commerce on the appropriateness and effectiveness of applying the commodity check-off program model to a nonagricultural industry.
Title
Concrete Masonry Products Research, Education, and Promotion Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] |
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 365. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. With written report No. 115-218. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1046 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Building construction
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Judicial review and appeals
Manufacturing
Marketing and advertising
Materials
User charges and fees
Administrative remedies
Building construction
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Judicial review and appeals
Manufacturing
Marketing and advertising
Materials
User charges and fees