US SB365 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to improve rangeland conditions and restore grazing levels within the Grand Staircase-Escalante National Monument, Utah. Directs the Department of the Interior to implement a management program within the areas of the Grand Staircase-Escalante National Monument in Utah that are administered by the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) to: (1) improve rangeland conditions for wildlife and livestock carrying capacity in those areas, and (2) restore livestock grazing to the level of usage in those areas that existed as of September 17, 1996. Requires Interior, in issuing or renewing grazing permits and in issuing or modifying allotment management plans for livestock grazing in those areas, to incorporate standards and guidelines that are consistent with: (1) the "Utah Standards for Rangeland Health and Guidelines for Grazing Management for BLM Lands in Utah", approved by the Secretary on May 20, 1997; and (2) the applicable BLM regulations contained in regulations relating to livestock grazing on public land.
Title
A bill to improve rangeland conditions and restore grazing levels within the Grand Staircase-Escalante National Monument, Utah.
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB743 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Subjects
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Livestock
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
Licensing and registrations
Livestock
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/365/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s365/BILLS-114s365is.pdf |