US SB3637 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-14 - Became Public Law No: 116-158. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to amend the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to extend lease protections for servicemembers under stop movement orders in response to a local, national, or global emergency, and for other purposes. This bill provides certain lease protections for service members under stop movement orders in response to a local, national, or global emergency. A service member may terminate a lease for premises or for a motor vehicle, and may not be charged an early termination fee for doing so, if the service member (1) enters into the lease upon receipt of certain military orders for permanent change of station, deployment with a military unit, or individual support of military operations; and (2) subsequently receives, in response to a local, national, or global emergency, a stop movement order for an indefinite period or at least 30 days. For the bill to apply in the case of a lease for premises, the stop movement order must prevent the service member or the service member's dependents from occupying the premises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to amend the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to extend lease protections for servicemembers under stop movement orders in response to a local, national, or global emergency, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-14SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-158. (TXT | PDF)
2020-08-14SenateSigned by President.
2020-08-04SenatePresented to President.
2020-07-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-07-20HouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H3113)
2020-07-20HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H3113)
2020-07-20HouseMr. Takano asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
2020-06-15HouseHeld at the desk.
2020-06-15HouseReceived in the House.
2020-06-15SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-06-10SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2898-2899)
2020-06-10SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2898-2899)
2020-05-06SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB6767 (Same As) 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback