US SB3630 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-279.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-279.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 218 North Milwaukee Street in Waterford, Wisconsin, as the "Captain Rhett W. Schiller Post Office."
Title
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 218 North Milwaukee Street in Waterford, Wisconsin, as the "Captain Rhett W. Schiller Post Office".
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Herb Kohl [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-14 | House | Became Public Law No: 112-279. |
2013-01-14 | House | Signed by President. |
2013-01-02 | House | Presented to President. |
2013-01-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-01-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7528) |
2013-01-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3630. |
2013-01-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7528) |
2013-01-01 | House | Mr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2012-12-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2012-12-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S8230) |
2012-12-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8230) |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security. |
2012-11-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Wisconsin
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Wisconsin