US SB3575 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Disabled Veterans Education Relief Act of 2020 This bill addresses Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) assistance entitlements and subsistence allowances. Under the bill, an assistance payment for training and rehabilitation programs for veterans with service-connected disabilities shall not be charged against an individual's entitlement to such assistance if an individual was unable to complete a course or program due to the closure of an educational institution or disapproval of the course. The bill also authorizes the VA to continue to pay subsistence allowances for a specified amount of time during periods following the permanent closure of an institution or the disapproval of a course of study.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disabled Veterans Education Relief Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB6262 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB6322 (Related) 2020-04-28 - Became Public Law No: 116-140. (TXT | PDF)
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback