US SB3554 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-453.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-453.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to extend the effective date for the sunset for collateral requirements for Small Business Administration disaster loans. (Sec. 1) This bill amends the RISE After Disaster Act of 2015 to extend by one year the increased threshold for the minimum major-disaster loan amount for which the Small Business Administration may require collateral.
Title
A bill to extend the effective date for the sunset for collateral requirements for Small Business Administration disaster loans.
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | House | By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-453. |
2018-11-29 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-280. |
2018-11-29 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-11-27 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-11-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-16 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9551) |
2018-11-16 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9551) |
2018-11-16 | House | Mr. Chabot asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2018-11-16 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-11-16 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-11-16 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7064; text: CR S7064) |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 631. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-10-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6826 (Related) 2018-09-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.