US SB3530 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Museum and Library Services Act of 2018 This bill amends and reauthorizes through FY2023 the Museum and Library Services Act and provides funding for library services and technology through FY2023. The bill expands the definition of "library" and "museum" to include a tribal library or museum and expands the services museums are authorized to provide. The Institute of Museum and Library Services, under the 21st Century Museum Professional Program established by this bill, may enter into arrangements with museum, museum consortia and associations, institutions of higher education, and other entities for projects to: increase the number of students from diverse and underrepresented backgrounds enrolled in graduate and undergraduate museum-related programs; recruit future museum professionals from such backgrounds; develop new or enhance current professional development and retention programs for museum professionals and the museum workforce; and support and conduct research, needs assessments, pilot programs, and evaluation of education and professional development programs to recruit, prepare, educate, and retain the next generation of museum professionals.
Title
Museum and Library Services Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-19 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 445 (Y: 331 N: 28 NV: 73 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-12-27 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-12-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 331 - 28 (Roll no. 445). (text: CR H10309-10312) |
2018-12-19 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10319-10320) |
2018-12-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Banks (IN) objected to the Yea - Nay vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2018-12-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3530. |
2018-12-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10309-10313) |
2018-12-19 | House | Mr. Banks (IN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-12-06 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-06 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7291-7298; text of measure as reported: CR S7292-7295; text of measure as passed: CR S7295-7298) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 707. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with amendments. Without written report. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-09-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2018-09-28 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S6389) |
Same As/Similar To
SB2271 (Related) 2017-12-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S8262-8293)
SB3530 (Same As) 2018-12-31 - Signed by President.
HB6988 (Same As) 2018-09-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB3530 (Same As) 2018-12-31 - Signed by President.
HB6988 (Same As) 2018-09-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
Adult education and literacy
Advisory bodies
Appropriations
Arts, culture, religion
Digital media
Economic development
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Executive agency funding and structure
Financial literacy
Health information and medical records
Higher education
Humanities programs funding
Indian social and development programs
Libraries and archives
Minority education
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Rural conditions and development
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
Advisory bodies
Appropriations
Arts, culture, religion
Digital media
Economic development
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Executive agency funding and structure
Financial literacy
Health information and medical records
Higher education
Humanities programs funding
Indian social and development programs
Libraries and archives
Minority education
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Rural conditions and development
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs