US SB3522 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Became Public Law No: 117-118.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Became Public Law No: 117-118.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide enhanced authority for the President to enter into agreements with the Government of Ukraine to lend or lease defense articles to that Government to protect civilian populations in Ukraine from Russian military invasion, and for other purposes.
Title
Ukraine Democracy Defense Lend-Lease Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - On passage (Y: 417 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-118. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-04-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-04-28 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 417 - 10 (Roll no. 141). (text: CR H4595) |
2022-04-28 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2022-04-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S. 3522. |
2022-04-28 | House | Rule provides for consideration of S. 3522 with 1 hour of general debate. The rule provides for consideration of S. 3522 under a closed rule. The rule provides that H. Res. 1035 is adopted and amends H. Res. 188. |
2022-04-28 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1065. (consideration: CR H4594-4601) |
2022-04-28 | House | Rule H. Res. 1065 passed House. |
2022-04-27 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1065 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of S. 3522 with 1 hour of general debate. The rule provides for consideration of S. 3522 under a closed rule. The rule provides that H. Res. 1035 is adopted and amends H. Res. 188. |
2022-04-07 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-04-07 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2052) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.5022 Amendment SA 5022 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S2052; text: CR S2052) In the nature of a substitute. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.5022 Amendment SA 5022 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2052) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6753 (Same As) 2022-02-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HR1065 (Related) 2022-04-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7611 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HR1065 (Related) 2022-04-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7611 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.