US SB3520 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment Insurance Extension Act of 2010 - Amends the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 with respect to the state-established individual emergency unemployment compensation account (EUCA). Extends the final date for entering a federal-state agreement under the Emergency Unemployment Compensation (EUC) program through December 31, 2010. Postpones the termination of the program until May 31, 2011. Amends the Assistance for Unemployed Workers and Struggling Families Act to extend through December 31, 2010: (1) federal-state agreements increasing regular unemployment compensation payments to individuals; and (2) requirements that federal payments to states cover 100% of EUC. Amends the Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 2008 to exempt weeks of unemployment between enactment of this Act and May 31, 2011, from the prohibition in the Federal-State Extended Unemployment Compensation Act of 1970 against federal matching payments to a state for the first week in an individual's eligibility period for which extended compensation or sharable regular compensation is paid if the state law provides for payment of regular compensation to an individual for his or her first week of otherwise compensable unemployment. (Thus allows temporary federal matching for the first week of extended benefits for states with no waiting period.)
Title
Unemployment Insurance Extension Act of 2010
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. | |
2010-06-22 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5246-5247, S5248-5249, S5250, S5252, S5253, S5256) |
Same As/Similar To
HB5618 (Related) 2010-07-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 459.
HB5647 (Related) 2010-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3551 (Related) 2010-06-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4213 (Related) 2010-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-205.
SB3706 (Related) 2010-08-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6419 (Related) 2010-11-18 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 258 - 154 (Roll no. 579).
SB3981 (Related) 2010-12-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S8343)
HB6556 (Related) 2010-12-17 - Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
SB3990 (Related) 2010-11-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5647 (Related) 2010-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3551 (Related) 2010-06-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4213 (Related) 2010-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-205.
SB3706 (Related) 2010-08-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6419 (Related) 2010-11-18 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 258 - 154 (Roll no. 579).
SB3981 (Related) 2010-12-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S8343)
HB6556 (Related) 2010-12-17 - Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
SB3990 (Related) 2010-11-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/3520/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s3520/BILLS-111s3520is.pdf |