US SB3510 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-221.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-221.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Director of the Office of Management and Budget to issue guidance with respect to natural disaster resilience, and for other purposes.
Title
Disaster Resiliency Planning Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-05 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-221. |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-11-28 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-11-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-11-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8482) |
2022-11-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3510. |
2022-11-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8482-8483) |
2022-11-14 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-06-23 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-06-23 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3096; text: CR S3096) |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 385. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-117. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7863 (Related) 2022-05-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.